FL S0324 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-09 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 347 (Ch. 2016-124)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-09 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 347 (Ch. 2016-124)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Creating the "Utility Cost Containment Bond Act"; authorizing certain local governmental entities to finance the costs of a utility project by issuing utility cost containment bonds upon application by a local agency; authorizing an authority to issue utility cost containment bonds for specified purposes related to utility projects; requiring the local agency or its publicly owned utility to collect the utility project charge, etc.
Title
Utility Projects
Sponsors
Senate Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities Committee | Senate Finance and Tax Committee | Sen. John Legg [R] | Sen. Wilton Simpson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-09 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 347 (Ch. 2016-124) |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 347 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Retained on Special Order Calendar |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Retained on Special Order Calendar |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/07/16 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/01/16, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2016-02-24 | Senate | CS/CS by Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities read 1st time |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2016-02-23 | Senate | CS/CS by Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; YEAS 8 NAYS 1 |
2016-02-18 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities, 02/23/16, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Office Building |
2016-02-10 | Senate | CS by Finance and Tax read 1st time |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Now in Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Remaining references corrected to Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; Appropriations |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2016-02-08 | Senate | CS by Finance and Tax; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-03 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 02/08/16, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Now in Finance and Tax |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Favorable by Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2016-01-07 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities, 01/12/16, 2:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building |
2015-10-06 | Senate | Referred to Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2015-09-18 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0347 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Chapter No. 2016-124
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
153 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
367 | 072 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |