FL H0347 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-28 - Chapter No. 2016-124
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-28 - Chapter No. 2016-124
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes certain local agencies to apply to certain local government agencies to finance costs of certain utility projects by issuing utility cost containment bonds; provides criteria in applying for funds; provides criteria of drafting financing resolution; provides procedures to establish or adjust utility projects; provides requirements for collection of project charges; specifies legal status of project charges for securing payment of bonds; specifies payment obligations & legal status of utility cost containment bonds.
Title
Utility Projects
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#11 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#698 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#698 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-28 | Chapter No. 2016-124 | |
2016-03-25 | Approved by Governor | |
2016-03-11 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2016-03-10 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2016-03-10 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/SB 324 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Withdrawn from Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; Finance and Tax; Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; Appropriations |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Received |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; Finance and Tax; Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; Appropriations |
2016-03-03 | Senate | In Messages |
2016-03-03 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 116 NAYS 0 |
2016-03-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-02 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2016-03-02 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (822187, 904239) |
2016-03-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-29 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/16 |
2016-01-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-01-14 | House | Favorable by- Regulatory Affairs Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-12 | House | CS by Finance and Tax Committee read 1st time |
2016-01-12 | House | On Committee agenda-- Regulatory Affairs Committee, 01/14/16, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2015-12-03 | House | Now in Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2015-12-02 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2015-12-01 | House | CS by Finance and Tax Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2015-11-24 | House | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax Committee, 12/01/15, 12:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2015-11-17 | House | Now in Finance and Tax Committee |
2015-11-17 | House | Favorable by Energy and Utilities Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 1 |
2015-11-10 | House | On Committee agenda-- Energy and Utilities Subcommittee, 11/17/15, 9:00 am, Webster Hall |
2015-10-30 | House | Referred to Energy and Utilities Subcommittee; Finance and Tax Committee; Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2015-10-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0324 (Similar To) 2016-03-09 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 347 (Ch. 2016-124)