FL S0324 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the duties of the association; authorizing the association to collect regular assessments directly from policyholders; authorizing the association to collect emergency assessments from insurers under certain circumstances, etc.
Title
Florida Insurance Guaranty Association
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | Senate | Died in Commerce and Tourism |
2013-04-04 | Senate | CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Now in Commerce and Tourism |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2013-04-02 | Senate | CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 04/02/13, 12:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2013-03-15 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 03/20/13, 3:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0211 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died on Calendar
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
631 | 52 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
631 | 57 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |