RI H7986 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
PROPERTY -- ABANDONED PROPERTY - Requires towns and cities to publish a list of abandoned properties and makes various other amendments relative to the sale of abandoned property by a receiver.
Title
Requires towns and cities to publish a list of abandoned properties and makes various other amendments relative to the sale of abandoned property by a receiver.
Sponsors
Rep. Jose Batista [D] | Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] | Rep. Scott Slater [D] | Rep. Joshua Giraldo [D] |
Rep. Karen Alzate [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-07 - House - Passage As Amended (Y: 60 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-07 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-07 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-24 | House | Signed by Governor |
2024-06-21 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2024-06-14 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2024-06-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/13/2024) |
2024-06-11 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2024-06-08 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/11/2024) |
2024-05-13 | Senate | Referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |
2024-05-07 | House | House passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2024-04-26 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/07/2024) |
2024-04-23 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2024-04-22 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2024-04-18 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/23/2024) |
2024-03-12 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/12/2024) |
2024-03-05 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |