FL S0294 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Budget, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7087 (Ch.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Budget, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7087 (Ch.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing Charlotte County to apply to the Department of Economic Opportunity for designation of an enterprise zone; providing application requirements; authorizing the department to designate an enterprise zone in Charlotte County; requiring that the department establish the initial effective date for the enterprise zone, etc.
Title
Enterprise Zones/Charlotte County
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Budget, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7087 (Ch. | |
2012-02-24 | Now in Budget -SJ 682 | |
2012-02-23 | Favorable by Budget Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 -SJ 682 | |
2012-02-20 | On Committee agenda-- Budget Subcommittee on Finance and Tax, 02/23/12, 8:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building | |
2012-01-31 | Now in Budget Subcommittee on Finance and Tax | |
2012-01-31 | Subreferred to Budget Subcommittee on Finance and Tax -SJ 301 | |
2012-01-30 | Now in Budget -SJ 300 | |
2012-01-30 | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 -SJ 300 | |
2012-01-25 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/30/12, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building | |
2012-01-19 | Now in Community Affairs -SJ 252 | |
2012-01-19 | Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 -SJ 252 | |
2012-01-13 | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 01/19/12, 8:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -SJ 30 | |
2011-10-04 | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Community Affairs; Budget -SJ 30 | |
2011-09-20 | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/294 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/0294/BillText/Filed/HTML |