FL S0272 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1009 (Ch. 2019-90)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1009 (Ch. 2019-90)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repealing provisions relating to the Florida Election Campaign Financing Act; deleting provisions governing the public funding of campaigns for candidates for statewide office who agree to certain expenditure limits, etc.
Title
Campaign Finance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Judiciary, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1009 (Ch. 2019-90) |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Favorable by Ethics and Elections; YEAS 4 NAYS 3 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-02-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 03/05/19, 2:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Ethics and Elections; Judiciary; Appropriations; Rules |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S270 (Related) 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
H615 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1009 (Ch. 2019-90)
H613 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar
S892 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1009 (Ch. 2019-90)
H1009 (Similar To) 2019-06-10 - Chapter No. 2019-90
H615 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1009 (Ch. 2019-90)
H613 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar
S892 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1009 (Ch. 2019-90)
H1009 (Similar To) 2019-06-10 - Chapter No. 2019-90
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
106 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
106 | 141 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
106 | 22 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
106 | 30 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
106 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
106 | 32 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
106 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
106 | 34 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
106 | 35 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
106 | 353 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
106 | 355 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
106 | 36 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
328 | 72 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
607 | 1622 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/272 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/272/BillText/Filed/HTML |