FL S0268 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Chapter No. 2018-16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Providing an exemption from public records requirements for certain identifying and location information of current or former public guardians, employees with fiduciary responsibility, and the spouses and children thereof; providing for future legislative review and repeal of the exemption; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Records/Public Guardians/Employees with Fiduciary Responsibility

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#819 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#17 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-21 Chapter No. 2018-16
2018-03-19 Approved by Governor
2018-03-12 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2018-03-05SenateOrdered enrolled
2018-03-05HouseCS passed; YEAS 113 NAYS 0
2018-03-05HouseRead 3rd time
2018-03-05HouseRead 2nd time
2018-03-05HouseSubstituted for CS/CS/HB 1037 906
2018-03-04HouseReceived
2018-03-04HouseReferred to Calendar
2018-03-02HouseIn Messages
2018-03-02SenateCS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
2018-03-02SenateRead 3rd time
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-01SenateRead 2nd time
2018-02-27SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/01/18
2018-02-07SenateCS/CS/CS by Rules read 1st time
2018-02-07SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-02-02SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-02-01SenateCS/CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 11 NAYS 1
2018-01-29SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/01/18, 11:30 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-23SenateCS/CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time
2018-01-19SenateNow in Rules
2018-01-17SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-01-16SenateCS/CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2018-01-11SenateOn Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/16/18, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building
2018-01-09SenateCS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-11-17SenateNow in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
2017-11-14SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2017-11-13SenateCS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2017-11-06SenateOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 11/13/17, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building
2017-11-06SenateOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 11/06/17, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building --Meeting cancelled
2017-09-22SenateReferred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2017-09-07SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1037 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/SB 268

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
11907Amended CodeSee Bill Text
74421031Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback