FL S0266 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 617
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Designating the "Marketable Record Title Act"; revising the notice filing requirements for a person claiming an interest in land and other rights; exempting a specified summary notice and amendment from certain notice content requirements; authorizing the parcel owners of a community not subject to a homeowners' association to use specified procedures to revive certain covenants or restrictions, subject to certain exceptions and requirements, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Covenants and Restrictions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-06SenateLaid on Table, refer to HB 617
2018-03-06SenateSubstituted HB 617
2018-03-06SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-02SenateCS by Rules read 1st time
2018-03-02SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/18
2018-03-02SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-02SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-03-01SenateCS by- Rules; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2018-02-28SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/01/18, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2018-02-21SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/26/18, 2:30 pm, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered
2018-01-11SenateNow in Rules
2018-01-10SenateFavorable by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2018-01-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/10/18, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2017-12-05SenateNow in Judiciary
2017-12-05SenateFavorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2017-11-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 12/05/17, 10:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building
2017-09-22SenateReferred to Community Affairs; Judiciary; Rules
2017-09-07SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H617 (Same As) 2018-03-22 - Chapter No. 2018-55

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
70209Amended CodeSee Bill Text
70210Amended CodeSee Bill Text
712001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
71201Amended CodeSee Bill Text
71205Amended CodeSee Bill Text
71206Amended CodeSee Bill Text
712095Amended CodeSee Bill Text
71211Amended CodeSee Bill Text
71212Amended CodeSee Bill Text
720303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7203032Amended CodeSee Bill Text
720403Amended CodeSee Bill Text
720404Amended CodeSee Bill Text
720405Amended CodeSee Bill Text
720407Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback