FL H0617 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Chapter No. 2018-55
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes certain parcel owners of a community not subject to HOA to use specified procedures to revive certain covenants or restrictions; revises interests & rights protected by filing for record within specified timeframe; revises & provides provisions relating to covenants and restrictions, including extinguishment, validity of notice, length of time certain covenants and restrictions are preserved, filing of notices, notice content requirements, requirements of property associations, & validity & enforceability.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Covenants and Restrictions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#11 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#813 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-22 Chapter No. 2018-55
2018-03-21 Approved by Governor
2018-03-14 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2018-03-07HouseOrdered enrolled
2018-03-07SenatePassed; YEAS 36 NAYS 0 847
2018-03-07SenateRead 3rd time
2018-03-06SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-06SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-06SenateSubstituted for CS/SB 266
2018-03-06SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-06SenateWithdrawn from Community Affairs; Judiciary; Rules
2018-03-05SenateReceived
2018-03-05SenateReferred to Community Affairs; Judiciary; Rules
2018-03-05SenateIn Messages
2018-03-05HousePassed as amended; YEAS 114 NAYS 0
2018-03-05HouseAmendment(s) adopted (986135)
2018-03-05HouseRead 3rd time
2018-03-02HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-02HouseRead 2nd time
2018-02-27HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/18
2018-02-01HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-01HouseFavorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
2018-01-30HouseOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 02/01/18, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall
2018-01-10HouseNow in Judiciary Committee
2018-01-10HouseFavorable by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2018-01-08HouseOn Committee agenda-- Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee, 01/10/18, 3:30 pm, 12 HOB
2017-12-07HouseNow in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
2017-12-06HouseFavorable by Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2017-11-29HouseOn Committee agenda-- Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee, 12/06/17, 4:00 pm, Sumner Hall
2017-11-15HouseReferred to Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2017-11-09HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S266 (Same As) 2018-03-06 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 617

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
70209Amended CodeSee Bill Text
70210Amended CodeSee Bill Text
712001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
71201Amended CodeSee Bill Text
71205Amended CodeSee Bill Text
71206Amended CodeSee Bill Text
712095Amended CodeSee Bill Text
71211Amended CodeSee Bill Text
71212Amended CodeSee Bill Text
720303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7203032Amended CodeSee Bill Text
720403Amended CodeSee Bill Text
720404Amended CodeSee Bill Text
720405Amended CodeSee Bill Text
720407Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback