FL S0256 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-13 - Chapter No. 2014-67
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-13 - Chapter No. 2014-67
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Creating an exemption from public records requirements for a forensic behavioral health evaluation filed with a court; providing retroactive application; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.
Title
Public Records/Forensic Behavioral Health Evaluation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-30 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#847 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#12 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#12 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-13 | Chapter No. 2014-67 | |
2014-06-13 | Approved by Governor | |
2014-06-05 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2014-04-30 | House | CS passed; YEAS 118 NAYS 0 |
2014-04-30 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-04-29 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2014-04-29 | House | Substituted for CS/CS/HB 111 |
2014-04-29 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-28 | House | Received |
2014-04-28 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/29/14 |
2014-04-28 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2014-04-11 | House | In Messages |
2014-04-03 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/26/14 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-10 | Senate | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time |
2014-03-07 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/12/14, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2014-03-06 | Senate | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-03-03 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/06/14, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2014-02-10 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/20/14, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered |
2014-01-06 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/16/14, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2013-12-10 | Senate | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2013-12-09 | Senate | Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2013-12-02 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 12/09/13, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building |
2013-11-04 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2013-10-10 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0111 (Similar To) 2014-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 256 (Ch. 2014-67)