FL S0252 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Providing that credit hours eligible for tuition and fee waivers be determined on a calendar year basis, rather than per academic term, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Employee Higher Education Fee Waivers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Appropriations
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-09SenateNow in Appropriations
2018-02-08SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Higher Education; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2018-02-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Higher Education, 02/08/18, 12:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2018-01-17SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Higher Education
2018-01-16SenateFavorable by Education; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2018-01-11SenateOn Committee agenda-- Education, 01/16/18, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-09-22SenateReferred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Higher Education; Appropriations
2017-09-05SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1371 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1009265Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback