FL S0252 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Chapter No. 2015-42
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Chapter No. 2015-42
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Increasing the number of years that a specified examination report remains valid and may be considered for the purpose of applying for a certificate of authority; providing that the absence of a countersignature does not affect the validity of a policy or contract of insurance; providing that the term "financial guaranty insurance" does not include guarantees of higher education loans unless written by a financial guaranty insurance corporation, etc.
Title
Insurance
Sponsors
Senate Rules Committee | Senate Judiciary Committee | Senate Banking and Insurance Committee | Sen. Christopher Smith [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#352 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#12 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#12 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-22 | Chapter No. 2015-42 | |
2015-05-21 | Approved by Governor | |
2015-05-07 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2015-04-24 | House | CS passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-24 | House | Substituted for CS/CS/HB 233 |
2015-04-23 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/24/15 |
2015-04-23 | House | Received |
2015-04-23 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2015-04-23 | House | In Messages |
2015-04-23 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Ordered engrossed |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (240292, 544922) |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Retained on Special Order Calendar |
2015-04-13 | Senate | CS/CS/CS by Rules read 1st time |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/14/15 |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2015-04-09 | Senate | CS/CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-06 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/09/15, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2015-04-02 | Senate | CS/CS by Judiciary read 1st time |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2015-03-31 | Senate | CS/CS by Judiciary; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/31/15, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2015-03-17 | Senate | CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2015-03-04 | Senate | CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-02-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 03/04/15, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Judiciary; Rules |
2015-01-07 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0233 (Similar To) 2015-04-24 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 252 (Ch. 2015-42)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
408 | 909 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
440 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
624 | 413 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
624 | 425 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 025 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 752 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 916 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 931 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 932 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 935 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 936 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 211 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 971 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
628 | 909 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |