FL S0246 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 22 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 121
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 121
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Increasing the income eligibility threshold for coverage under the Medikids program component; increasing the income eligibility threshold for coverage under the Florida Kidcare program; requiring an applicant seeking coverage under the program to provide certain documentation if eligibility cannot be verified using reliable data sources; requiring that premiums for certain enrollees under the Florida Kidcare program be based on a tiered system of uniform premiums, etc.
Title
Florida Kidcare Program Eligibility
Sponsors
Senate Fiscal Policy Committee | Senate Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services | Sen. Alexis Calatayud [R] | Sen. Keith Perry [R] |
Sen. Rosalind Osgood [D] | Sen. Ana Rodriguez [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-20 - Senate - Senate Fiscal Policy (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate Health Policy (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate Health Policy (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 121 |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/HB 121 |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/03/23 |
2023-04-25 | Senate | CS/CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2023-04-20 | Senate | CS/CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2023-04-17 | Senate | CS by Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services read 1st time |
2023-04-17 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/20/23, 9:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Now in Fiscal Policy |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2023-04-12 | Senate | CS by Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2023-04-06 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services, 04/12/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Favorable by Health Policy; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 03/13/23, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; Fiscal Policy |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H121 (Similar To) 2023-05-04 - Ordered enrolled
H1245 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died in Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee
H1245 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died in Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
409 | 8132 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 814 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 816 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
624 | 91 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |