FL H0121 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-22 - Chapter No. 2023-277
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-22 - Chapter No. 2023-277
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Increases income eligibility threshold for coverage under Medikids program component; increases income eligibility threshold for coverage under Florida Kidcare program; requires applicant seeking coverage under program to provide certain documentation if eligibility cannot be verified using reliable data sources; requires that premiums for certain enrollees under Florida Kidcare program be based on tiered system of uniform premiums.
Title
Florida Kidcare Program Eligibility
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#21 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#108 (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - House - House Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - House - House Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#108 (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - House - House Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - House - House Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-22 | Chapter No. 2023-277 | |
2023-06-22 | Approved by Governor | |
2023-06-12 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2023-05-04 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2023-05-04 | House | In Messages |
2023-05-04 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/SB 246 |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Withdrawn from Fiscal Policy |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Received |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Referred to Fiscal Policy |
2023-04-13 | Senate | In Messages |
2023-04-13 | House | CS passed; YEAS 105, NAYS 0 |
2023-04-13 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-13 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2023-04-13 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-10 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/13/2023) |
2023-03-30 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2023-03-30 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2023-03-30 | House | Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee |
2023-03-30 | House | Favorable by Health & Human Services Committee |
2023-03-28 | House | Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda |
2023-03-24 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2023-03-24 | House | Now in Health & Human Services Committee |
2023-03-24 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2023-03-23 | House | CS Filed |
2023-03-23 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2023-03-23 | House | Reported out of Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-03-22 | House | Favorable with CS by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-03-20 | House | Added to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee agenda |
2023-03-17 | House | Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-03-17 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2023-03-17 | House | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-03-16 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2023-03-16 | House | CS Filed |
2023-03-16 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2023-03-16 | House | Reported out of Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee |
2023-03-16 | House | Favorable with CS by Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee |
2023-03-14 | House | Added to Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee agenda |
2023-03-07 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-01-17 | House | Now in Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee |
2023-01-17 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2023-01-17 | House | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-01-17 | House | Referred to Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee |
2023-01-05 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S246 (Similar To) 2023-05-03 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 121 (Ch. 2023-277)
H1245 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died in Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 121 (Ch. 2023-277)
H1245 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died in Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 121 (Ch. 2023-277)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
409 | 8132 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 814 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 816 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
624 | 91 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |