FL S0246 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Criminal Justice Information Program to establish, implement, and maintain a system for submitting an annual report to the Federal Bureau of Investigation, etc.
Title
Crime Reports
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Farmer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Criminal Justice |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-09-22 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Rules |
2017-08-31 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/246 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/246/BillText/Filed/HTML |