FL S0232 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Expanding the list of incidents or injuries that constitute harm to a child's health or welfare; expanding the types of reports that the Department of Children and Families must refer to Child Protection Teams, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child Welfare

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Judiciary
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-14SenateCS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2019-11-18SenateNow in Judiciary
2019-11-13SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-11-12SenateCS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2019-11-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 11/12/19, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Building
2019-09-19SenateReferred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Judiciary; Rules
2019-09-06SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H413 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Health and Human Services Committee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3901Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39303Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback