FL H0413 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Expands definition of term "harm" to include violations of certain motor vehicle laws that result in death of, or injury to, child; expands types of reports that DCF must refer to Child Protection Teams.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child Welfare

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14HouseDied in Health and Human Services Committee
2020-03-14HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-15HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2020-01-15HouseFavorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2020-01-13HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/15/20, 1:00 pm, Sumner Hall
2019-12-13HouseNow in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2019-12-12HouseFavorable by Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2019-12-05HouseOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee, 12/12/19, 9:00 am, 12 HOB
2019-10-30HouseReferred to Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2019-10-18HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S232 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3901Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39302Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39521Amended CodeSee Bill Text
396012Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback