FL S0226 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-20 - Chapter No. 2014-170
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-20 - Chapter No. 2014-170
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Creating a public records exemption for certain images and data obtained through the use of an automated license plate recognition system and personal identifying information of an individual in data generated from such images; providing conditions for disclosure of such images and information, etc.
Title
Public Records/Automated License Plate Recognition Systems Exemption
Sponsors
Senate Governmental Oversight and Accountability Committee | Senate Transportation Committee | Sen. Jeffrey Brandes [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#797 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#20 (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#20 (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-20 | Chapter No. 2014-170 | |
2014-06-20 | Approved by Governor | |
2014-06-13 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2014-04-28 | House | CS passed; YEAS 116 NAYS 0 |
2014-04-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-04-28 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2014-04-28 | House | Substituted for CS/CS/CS/HB 599 |
2014-04-28 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-25 | House | Received |
2014-04-25 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/28/14 |
2014-04-25 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2014-04-23 | House | In Messages |
2014-04-11 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 1 |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/03/14 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-25 | Senate | CS/CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time |
2014-03-21 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/26/14, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2014-03-20 | Senate | CS/CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-17 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/20/14, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2014-03-04 | Senate | CS by Transportation read 1st time |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2014-01-09 | Senate | CS by Transportation; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2013-12-19 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 01/09/14, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building |
2013-10-10 | Senate | Referred to Transportation; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2013-10-01 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0555 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Economic Affairs Committee
H0553 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee
H0599 (Same As) 2014-04-28 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 226 (Ch. 2014-170)
H0553 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee
H0599 (Same As) 2014-04-28 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 226 (Ch. 2014-170)