FL S0222 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-15 - Chapter No. 2015-14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Creating the "Computer Abuse and Data Recovery Act"; prohibiting a person from intentionally committing specified acts without authorization with respect to a protected computer; specifying remedies for civil actions brought by persons affected by a violation; providing that the act does not prohibit specified activity by certain state, federal, and foreign law enforcement agencies, regulatory agencies, and political subdivisions, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electronic Commerce

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#241 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#5 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-15 Chapter No. 2015-14
2015-05-14 Approved by Governor
2015-05-07 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2015-04-22SenateOrdered enrolled
2015-04-22HouseCS passed; YEAS 117 NAYS 0
2015-04-22HouseRead 3rd time
2015-04-21HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2015-04-21HouseRead 2nd time
2015-04-21HouseSubstituted for CS/CS/CS/HB 175
2015-04-17HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/21/15
2015-04-17HouseReceived
2015-04-17HouseReferred to Calendar
2015-04-14HouseIn Messages
2015-04-14SenateImmediately certified
2015-04-14SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
2015-04-14SenateRead 3rd time
2015-04-08SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2015-04-08SenateOrdered engrossed
2015-04-08SenateAmendment(s) adopted (748330)
2015-04-08SenateRead 2nd time
2015-04-02SenateCS/CS/CS by Judiciary read 1st time
2015-04-02SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/08/15
2015-04-02SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2015-04-02SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2015-03-31SenateCS/CS/CS by- Judiciary; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2015-03-26SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/31/15, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2015-03-17SenateCS/CS by Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities read 1st time
2015-03-12SenateNow in Judiciary
2015-03-12SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2015-03-10SenateCS/CS by Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2015-03-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities, 03/10/15, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building
2015-03-03SenateCS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time
2015-03-03SenateIntroduced
2015-02-18SenateNow in Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities
2015-02-17SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2015-02-16SenateCS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 4 NAYS 0
2015-02-09SenateOn Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 02/16/15, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2015-01-13SenateReferred to Commerce and Tourism; Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; Judiciary
2014-12-31SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H0175 (Same As) 2015-04-21 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 222 (Ch. 2015-14)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
668801Amended CodeSee Bill Text
668802Amended CodeSee Bill Text
668803Amended CodeSee Bill Text
668804Amended CodeSee Bill Text
668805Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/222
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0222/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0222/BillText/c1/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0222/BillText/c2/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0222/BillText/c3/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0222/BillText/e1/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0222/BillText/er/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0222/Amendment/264498/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0222/Amendment/807090/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0222/Amendment/949828/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0222/Amendment/872716/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0222/Amendment/748330/HTML
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0222/Vote/SenateVote_s0222e1005.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0222/Vote/HouseVote_s0222e1241.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback