FL S0220 | 2018 | Regular Session


Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 20 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-03-12 - Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]


Authorizing lienholders to use certain documents as an admission in an action to foreclose a mortgage; providing that submission of certain documents in a foreclosure action creates a rebuttable presumption that the defendant has waived any defenses to the foreclosure; requiring a court to take judicial notice of orders entered in bankruptcy cases under certain circumstances, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Bankruptcy Matters in Foreclosure Proceedings


Roll Calls

2018-02-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#598 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#5 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]


2018-03-12 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2018-02-20SenateOrdered enrolled
2018-02-14HousePassed; YEAS 111 NAYS 0
2018-02-14HouseRead 3rd time
2018-02-14HouseRead 2nd time
2018-02-14HouseSubstituted for HB 271
2018-02-08HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/14/18
2018-02-08HouseReferred to Calendar
2018-02-08HouseIn Messages
2018-02-07SenatePassed; YEAS 35 NAYS 0
2018-02-07SenateRead 3rd time
2018-02-01SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-02-01SenateRead 2nd time
2018-01-30SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/01/18
2018-01-11SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-01-11SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2018-01-08SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/11/18, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2017-12-06SenateNow in Rules
2017-12-05SenateFavorable by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2017-11-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 12/05/17, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2017-11-07SenateNow in Judiciary
2017-11-07SenateFavorable by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2017-10-30SenateOn Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 11/07/17, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2017-09-22SenateReferred to Banking and Insurance; Judiciary; Rules

Same As/Similar To

H271 (Same As) 2018-02-14 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 220

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
70212Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

Bill Comments