FL S0212 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Banking and Insurance, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 76 (Ch. 2021-77)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Banking and Insurance, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 76 (Ch. 2021-77)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing that for certain attorney fees awarded for claims arising under property insurance policies, a strong presumption is created that a lodestar fee is sufficient and reasonable; providing that such presumption may be rebutted only under certain circumstances, etc.
Title
Contingency Risk Multipliers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Banking and Insurance, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 76 (Ch. 2021-77) |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-12-15 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Judiciary; Rules |
2020-12-07 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H305 (Similar To) 2021-04-27 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 76 (Ch. 2021-77), CS/CS/SB 1598 (Ch. 2021-104)
S76 (Similar To) 2021-06-14 - Chapter No. 2021-77, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1598 (Ch. 2021-104)
S76 (Similar To) 2021-06-14 - Chapter No. 2021-77, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1598 (Ch. 2021-104)
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/212 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/212/BillText/Filed/HTML |