FL S0208 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing an amendment to the State Constitution to automatically restore the voting rights and right to hold public office of certain convicted felons, etc.
Title
Convicted Felons/Voting Rights and Right to Hold Public Office
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Died in Ethics and Elections |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Ethics and Elections; Judiciary; Fiscal Policy; Rules |
2014-12-22 | Senate | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/208 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0208/BillText/Filed/HTML |