FL S0208 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 3 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that persons with developmental disabilities have a right to be free from negligence. Specifies that entities as well as individuals are liable for damages. Prohibits the operator of a public lodging or food establishment from discriminating on the basis of disability. Applies administrative and civil remedies available under the Florida Civil Rights Act of 1992 to certain violations against persons with disabilities. Creates the "Floridians with Disabilities Act," etc.
Title
Persons With Disabilities
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Fasano [R] | Sen. Don Gaetz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -SJ 25 | |
2011-02-14 | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 02/22/11, 9:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed | |
2010-12-16 | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Commerce and Tourism; Judiciary; Budget -SJ 25 | |
2010-12-03 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0361 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
S0346 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
S0346 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
393 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
509 | 092 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
760 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
760 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
760 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
760 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
760 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
760 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
760 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
760 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/208 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/0208/BillText/Filed/HTML |