FL H0361 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates act "Competitive Workforce Act"; prohibits discrimination based on sexual orientation & gender identity or expression; defines terms; substitutes references to "disability" for references to "handicap"; revises & conforms terminology.
Title
Prohibited Discrimination
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 36 | |
2011-02-07 | Referred to Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee; Civil Justice Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 36 | |
2011-01-24 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0346 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
S0208 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
S0208 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
419 | 001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
509 | 092 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
760 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
760 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
760 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
760 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
760 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
760 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
760 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
760 | 22 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
760 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
760 | 24 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
760 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
760 | 26 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
760 | 29 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
760 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
760 | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
760 | 50 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
760 | 6 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
760 | 60 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/361 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/0361/BillText/Filed/HTML |