FL S0192 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the term "expenditure" to exclude the use of a public facility or public property that is made available by a governmental entity to a legislator for a public purpose, to exempt such use from legislative lobbying requirements; providing exceptions when a member or an employee of the Legislature may accept certain expenditures made by a lobbyist or a principal; providing for the future expiration and the reversion as of a specified date of statutory text, etc.
Title
Legislative Lobbying Expenditures
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | Senate | Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Favorable by Ethics and Elections; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2014-02-10 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 02/17/14, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2013-10-08 | Senate | Referred to Ethics and Elections; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Judiciary; Rules |
2013-09-24 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0133 (Same As) 2014-05-02 - Died in Ethics and Elections Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/192 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/0192/BillText/Filed/HTML |