FL S0182 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Transportation to create a Small Business Road Construction Mitigation Grant Program; requiring the department to disburse grants to qualified businesses for the purpose of maintaining the businesses during a road construction project; providing that any grant awarded offsets any civil damages against the Department of Transportation, etc.
Title
Small Business Road Construction Mitigation Grant Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-02-08 | Senate | CS by Transportation read 1st time |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2018-02-06 | Senate | CS by Transportation; YEAS 6 NAYS 1 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 02/06/18, 2:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-08-28 | Senate | Referred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2017-08-21 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H567 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee