FL H0567 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1-1)
Status: Introduced on November 7 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-09 - CS by Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee read 1st time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Requires DOT to create Small Business Road Construction Mitigation Grant Program; requires disbursement of grants to qualified businesses; limits grant amount; provides eligibility requirements; requires assistance by DEO; provides for award prioritization; requires report & rulemaking.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Small Business Road Construction Mitigation Grant Program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-09HouseCS by Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee read 1st time
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-12-12HouseNow in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
2017-12-11HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2017-12-06HouseCS by Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2017-11-29HouseOn Committee agenda-- Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee, 12/06/17, 10:30 am, Reed Hall
2017-11-15HouseReferred to Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee
2017-11-07HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S182 (Similar To) 2018-02-08 - CS by Transportation read 1st time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
33928154Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback