FL S0180 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-25 - Chapter No. 2016-5, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 182 (Ch. 2016-6)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-25 - Chapter No. 2016-5, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 182 (Ch. 2016-6)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Including financial information in provisions prohibiting the theft, embezzlement, or unlawful copying of trade secrets; providing criminal penalties, etc.
Title
Trade Secrets
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-01-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#495 (Y: 116 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#8 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#8 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-25 | Chapter No. 2016-5, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 182 (Ch. 2016-6) | |
2016-02-24 | Approved by Governor | |
2016-02-18 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2016-01-27 | House | CS passed; YEAS 116 NAYS 3 |
2016-01-27 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-01-26 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2016-01-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-01-26 | House | Substituted for CS/HB 55 |
2016-01-22 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 01/26/16 |
2016-01-21 | House | Received |
2016-01-21 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2016-01-21 | House | In Messages |
2016-01-15 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 34 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-15 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-01-12 | Senate | CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 01/13/16 |
2015-12-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2015-12-03 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2015-11-23 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 12/03/15, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2015-11-18 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2015-11-17 | Senate | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2015-11-09 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 11/17/15, 1:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building |
2015-10-26 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 11/02/15, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building --Meeting cancelled |
2015-10-07 | Senate | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2015-10-07 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2015-10-05 | Senate | CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2015-09-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 10/05/15, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2015-09-09 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2015-08-25 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0182 (Related) 2016-02-25 - Chapter No. 2016-6, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 180 (Ch. 2016-5)
H0055 (Similar To) 2016-01-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 180 (Ch. 2016-5), CS/CS/SB 182 (Ch. 2016-6)
H0057 (Similar To) 2016-01-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 182 (Ch. 2016-6), CS/SB 180 (Ch. 2016-5)
H0055 (Similar To) 2016-01-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 180 (Ch. 2016-5), CS/CS/SB 182 (Ch. 2016-6)
H0057 (Similar To) 2016-01-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 182 (Ch. 2016-6), CS/SB 180 (Ch. 2016-5)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
581 | 199 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
721 | 071 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
812 | 035 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
812 | 081 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
815 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |