FL H0055 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on August 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 180 (Ch. 2016-5), CS/CS/SB 182 (Ch. 2016-6)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 180 (Ch. 2016-5), CS/CS/SB 182 (Ch. 2016-6)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Includes financial information in provisions prohibiting theft, embezzlement, or unlawful copying of trade secrets; provides penalties; reenacts provisions.
Title
Trade Secrets
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-26 | House | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 180 (Ch. 2016-5), CS/CS/SB 182 (Ch. 2016-6) |
2016-01-26 | House | Substituted CS/SB 180 |
2016-01-22 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 01/26/16 |
2016-01-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-01-13 | House | Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-12 | House | CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2016-01-11 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 01/13/16, 3:30 pm, Sumner Hall |
2015-12-02 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2015-12-02 | House | Favorable by Government Operations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2015-11-24 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Operations Subcommittee, 12/02/15, 9:00 am, Webster Hall |
2015-11-19 | House | Now in Government Operations Subcommittee |
2015-11-18 | House | Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2015-11-10 | House | On Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 11/18/15, 1:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2015-09-21 | House | Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2015-09-17 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2015-09-16 | House | CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2015-09-09 | House | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 09/16/15, 10:30 am, Sumner Hall |
2015-08-27 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Government Operations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2015-08-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0057 (Related) 2016-01-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 182 (Ch. 2016-6), CS/SB 180 (Ch. 2016-5)
S0180 (Similar To) 2016-02-25 - Chapter No. 2016-5, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 182 (Ch. 2016-6)
S0182 (Similar To) 2016-02-25 - Chapter No. 2016-6, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 180 (Ch. 2016-5)
S0180 (Similar To) 2016-02-25 - Chapter No. 2016-5, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 182 (Ch. 2016-6)
S0182 (Similar To) 2016-02-25 - Chapter No. 2016-6, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 180 (Ch. 2016-5)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
581 | 199 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
721 | 071 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
812 | 035 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
812 | 081 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
815 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |