FL S0176 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Deleting a provision prohibiting concealed carry licensees from openly carrying a handgun or carrying a concealed weapon or firearm into a college or university facility, etc.
Title
Licenses to Carry Concealed Weapons or Firearms
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Evers [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Favorable by Higher Education; YEAS 6 NAYS 3 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Higher Education, 03/16/15, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Now in Higher Education |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 3 NAYS 2 |
2015-02-09 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/16/15, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Higher Education; Judiciary; Rules |
2014-12-11 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H4005 (Same As) 2015-04-28 - Died on Calendar
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/176 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0176/BillText/Filed/HTML |