FL S0158 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Increasing the value of a motor vehicle owned by a natural person which is exempt from legal process, etc.
Title
Value of Motor Vehicles Exempt from Legal Process
Sponsors
Sen. Tina Polsky [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#854 (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#3 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - Senate - Senate Community Affairs (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-09 - Senate - Senate Judiciary (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#3 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - Senate - Senate Community Affairs (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-09 - Senate - Senate Judiciary (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | Approved by Governor | |
2024-04-16 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2024-03-05 | House | Passed; YEAS 112, NAYS 0 |
2024-03-05 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-03-04 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2024-03-04 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2024-03-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-03-01 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2024-03-01 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/4/2024) |
2024-03-01 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2024-02-14 | House | In Messages |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0 |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/14/24 |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2024-01-25 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/30/24, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2024-01-17 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/22/24, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Building |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Now in Community Affairs |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-01-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/09/24, 2:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2023-10-17 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Community Affairs; Rules |
2023-10-10 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H29 (Same As) 2024-03-04 - Laid on Table