FL S0154 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 19 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-11-13 - Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Revising the required health education in public schools to include information regarding the dangers and signs of human trafficking; requiring the Department of Legal Affairs to develop human trafficking awareness campaigns, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Human Trafficking Education in Schools

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-13SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-11-12SenateCS by Education; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2019-11-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Education, 11/12/19, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-09-19SenateReferred to Education; Criminal Justice; Appropriations
2019-08-19SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H105 (Same As) 2019-09-23 - Referred to PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Education Committee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100342Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback