FL H0105 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Revises required health education in public schools to include information regarding dangers & signs of human trafficking; authorizes student to opt out of specified portion of health education; & requires DLA to develop human trafficking awareness campaigns.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Human Trafficking Education in Schools

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14HouseDied in PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee
2020-03-14HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2019-09-23HouseReferred to PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Education Committee
2019-09-03HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S154 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Messages

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100342Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback