FL S0150 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-12-11 - Now in Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Encouraging counties and municipalities to, by a specified date, establish a sanitary sewer lateral inspection program; requiring a seller of real property to disclose any known defects in the property's sanitary sewer lateral, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sanitary Sewer Laterals

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-11SenateNow in Rules
2019-12-10SenateFavorable by Judiciary; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2019-12-02SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 12/10/19, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-11-14SenateNow in Judiciary
2019-11-13SenateFavorable by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 4 NAYS 0
2019-11-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 11/13/19, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Building
2019-09-03SenateReferred to Environment and Natural Resources; Judiciary; Rules
2019-08-16SenateFiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
689301Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback