FL S0142 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Ratifying the proposed amendment to the United States Constitution relating to equal rights for men and women, etc.
Title
Equal Rights for Men and Women
Sponsors
Sen. Lori Berman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-10-17 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Ethics and Elections; Rules |
2023-10-09 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H647 (Same As) 2024-03-08 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/142 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/142/BillText/Filed/HTML |