FL S0142 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Exempting nonresidential farm buildings, farm fences, and farm signs that are located on lands used for bona fide agricultural purposes from any county or municipal special assessment, including a dependent special district assessment, etc.
Title
Nonresidential Farm Buildings
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2015-03-24 | Senate | CS by Finance and Tax read 1st time |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2015-03-23 | Senate | CS by Finance and Tax; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 03/23/15, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Now in Finance and Tax |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2015-01-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/21/15, 3:30 pm, 301 Senate Office Building |
2014-12-12 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2014-11-21 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0031 (Same As) 2015-04-28 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee