FL S0136 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-27 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 179 (Ch. 2023-182)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-27 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 179 (Ch. 2023-182)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Creating the "Florida Kratom Consumer Protection Act"; prohibiting processors from selling, preparing, distributing, or exposing for sale certain kratom products; prohibiting processors from distributing, selling, or exposing for sale a kratom product to an individual under 21 years of age; requiring processors to annually register kratom products with the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services, etc.
Title
Florida Kratom Consumer Protection Act
Sponsors
Senate Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government | Senate Commerce and Tourism Committee | Sen. Joe Gruters [R] | Sen. Linda Stewart [D] |
Sen. Keith Perry [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-20 - Senate - Senate Fiscal Policy (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Tourism (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Tourism (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-27 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 179 (Ch. 2023-182) |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 179 |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/23 |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 18 NAYS 1 |
2023-04-17 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government read 1st time |
2023-04-17 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/20/23, 9:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Now in Fiscal Policy |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2023-04-12 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 12 NAYS 1 |
2023-04-06 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 04/12/23, 11:30 am, 110 Senate Building |
2023-03-08 | Senate | CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-03-06 | Senate | CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2023-02-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 03/06/23, 3:30 pm, 401 Senate Building |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Fiscal Policy |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H179 (Similar To) 2023-06-02 - Chapter No. 2023-182