FL S0130 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on November 23 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Eliminates provisions directing the Department of Health to create and administer a statewide septic tank evaluation program. Eliminates procedures and criteria for the evaluation program. Repeals a provision to terminate the grant program for repair of onsite sewage treatment disposal systems identified pursuant to the evaluation program, to conform, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Onsite Sewage Treatment and Disposal Systems

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2011-03-08 Introduced -SJ 20
2010-11-29 Referred to Health Regulation; Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Budget -SJ 20
2010-11-23 Filed

Same As/Similar To

H0013 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
S0082 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
S0168 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
H0167 () 2011-01-12 - Withdrawn prior to introduction -HJ 21
S1698 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3810065Amended CodeSee Bill Text
38100656Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3810066Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback