FL S1698 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Defines the term "bedroom." Provides for any permit issued and approved by the Department of Health for the installation, modification, or repair of an onsite sewage treatment and disposal system to transfer with the title of the property. Provides circumstances in which an onsite sewage treatment and disposal system is not considered abandoned. Provides for the validity of an onsite sewage treatment and disposal system permit if rules change before final approval of the constructed system, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Onsite Sewage Treatment and Disposal Systems

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2011-05-05 Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/05/11
2011-05-02 Withdrawn from Budget -SJ 672
2011-04-26 CS/CS/CS by Community Affairs read 1st time -SJ 490
2011-04-14 Now in Budget -SJ 470
2011-04-13 Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2011-04-11 CS/CS/CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 1 -SJ 470
2011-04-06 On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 04/11/11, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2011-04-05 Now in Community Affairs -SJ 323
2011-04-01 Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2011-03-30 Remaining references corrected to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Community Affairs; Budget -SJ 320
2011-03-29 Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2011-03-28 CS by Health Regulation; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 -SJ 309
2011-03-23 On Committee agenda-- Health Regulation, 03/28/11, 3:15 pm, 412 Knott Building
2011-03-10 Referred to Health Regulation; Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Budget -SJ 192
2011-03-04 Filed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3810065Amended CodeSee Bill Text
38100656Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3810066Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback