FL S0126 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on August 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced
Pending: Senate Finance and Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Revising the definition of the term "retail sale"; renaming the term "mail order sale" to "remote sale" and revising the definition; revising conditions under which certain dealers are subject to sales tax levies and collection; providing that certain marketplace providers are subject to registration, collection, and remittance requirements for sales taxes, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sales and Use Tax

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2019-10-15SenateNow in Finance and Tax
2019-10-15SenateFavorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2019-10-07SenateOn Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 10/15/19, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building
2019-09-03SenateReferred to Commerce and Tourism; Finance and Tax; Appropriations
2019-08-14SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H159 (Similar To) 2020-01-14 - Introduced

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
21202Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21205Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2120596Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21205965Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21206Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21212Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21218Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21220Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback