FL S0124 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Chapter No. 2020-146
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Chapter No. 2020-146
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the purposes of ch. 751, F.S.; revising the requirements for individuals seeking concurrent custody; allowing any other provisions related to the best interest of the child to be considered in a petition for temporary or concurrent custody; authorizing courts to include provisions requested in petitions for temporary or concurrent custody which relate to the best interest of the child, etc.
Title
Custody of Minor Children by Extended Family
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#660 (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#2 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#2 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-01 | Chapter No. 2020-146 | |
2020-06-30 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-16 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2020-03-10 | House | CS passed; YEAS 115 NAYS 1 |
2020-03-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-09 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-06 | House | Received |
2020-03-06 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/09/20 |
2020-03-06 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2020-02-13 | House | In Messages |
2020-02-12 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 34 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Ordered engrossed |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (652166) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/06/20 |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-24 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/29/20, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2020-01-14 | Senate | CS/CS by Judiciary read 1st time |
2020-01-14 | Senate | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-12-13 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2019-12-12 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-12-10 | Senate | CS/CS by Judiciary; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2019-12-02 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 12/10/19, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2019-11-07 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2019-11-06 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-11-05 | Senate | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2019-10-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 11/05/19, 2:00 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2019-09-03 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Judiciary; Rules |
2019-08-12 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H185 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/CS/SB 124 passed
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
751 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
751 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
751 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
751 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
751 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |