FL H0185 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on September 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-09 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/CS/SB 124 passed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Revises requirements for individual seeking concurrent custody; requires petition for temporary or concurrent custody to include provisions relating to best interest of child; authorizes court to include provisions relating to best interest of child in order granting temporary or concurrent custody; authorizes court to modify & establish reasonable conditions for transition of custody; requires court to consider specified factors when establishing such conditions; authorizes court to require parties to comply with specified provisions in order before terminating order.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Custody of Minor Children by Extended Family

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-09HouseLaid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/CS/SB 124 passed
2020-02-07HouseCS/CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time
2020-02-07HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-06HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2020-01-30HouseCS/CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2020-01-28HouseOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 01/30/20, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall
2020-01-21HouseCS by Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee read 1st time
2020-01-21HouseNow in Judiciary Committee
2020-01-17HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2020-01-16HouseCS by Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2020-01-14HouseOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee, 01/16/20, 9:00 am, 12 HOB
2019-12-05HouseOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee, 12/12/19, 9:00 am, 12 HOB -- Temporarily Postponed
2019-11-15HouseNow in Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee
2019-11-14HouseFavorable by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2019-11-07HouseOn Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 11/14/19, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall
2019-09-25HouseReferred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2019-09-17HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S124 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Ordered enrolled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
75101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
751011Amended CodeSee Bill Text
75102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
75103Amended CodeSee Bill Text
75105Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback