FL S0124 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Chapter No. 2019-10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Chapter No. 2019-10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Specifying the venue in proceedings for the appointment of a guardian for a child or young adult who has been adjudicated dependent; authorizing a court to receive and consider any information provided by the Guardian Ad Litem Program and the child's attorney ad litem if a child is under the jurisdiction of a dependency court, etc.
Title
Dependent Children
Sponsors
Senate Judiciary Committee | Sen. Aaron Bean [R] | Sen. Bill Montford [D] | Sen. Gayle Harrell [R] |
Sen. Janet Cruz [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#56 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#11 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#11 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | Chapter No. 2019-10 | |
2019-04-26 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-04-22 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2019-04-11 | House | CS passed; YEAS 116 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2019-04-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-10 | House | Substituted for CS/HB 115 |
2019-04-04 | House | Received |
2019-04-04 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/10/19 |
2019-04-04 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2019-04-03 | House | In Messages |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2019-04-03 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/03/19 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-08 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/13/19, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Building |
2019-03-05 | Senate | CS by Judiciary read 1st time |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | CS by Judiciary; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2019-01-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/04/19, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Favorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2019-01-15 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 01/22/19, 12:30 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Judiciary; Rules |
2018-12-03 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H115 (Similar To) 2019-04-10 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 124 (Ch. 2019-10)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
322 | 051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
382 | 0255 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
744 | 1097 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 43 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 441 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 455 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 461 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |