FL S0122 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempting from the sales tax certain separately stated charges imposed on a lessee or licensee of leased or licensed premises, etc.
Title
Sales Tax Exemptions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | Senate | Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2013-01-15 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 01/22/13, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2013-01-04 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2012-12-18 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0765 (Same As) 2013-05-03 - Died in Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/122 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0122/BillText/Filed/HTML |