FL H0765 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Exempts from sales tax certain separately stated charges imposed on lessee or licensee of leased or licensed premises.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sales Tax Exemptions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-03HouseDied in Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee
2013-03-05HouseIntroduced
2013-02-20HouseReferred to Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee; Finance and Tax Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee
2013-02-13HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S0122 (Same As) 2013-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
212031Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback