FL S0120 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extending the scheduled expiration of the pilot program, etc.
Title
Early Childhood Music Education Incentive Pilot Program
Sponsors
Sen. Keith Perry [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#25 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in Messages |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-04-26 | House | In Messages |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/25/19 |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/11/19, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Education, 03/19/19, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Favorable by Education; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2019-01-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education, 02/05/19, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations |
2018-12-03 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1357 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee