FL S0116 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repealing a provision relating to home protection and the use of deadly force, which created a presumption of fear of death or great bodily harm in certain circumstances and provided that a person has no duty to retreat and has the right to stand his or her ground and meet force with force in certain circumstances, etc.
Title
Use of Deadly Force in Defense of a Person
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-09-11 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Criminal Justice; Rules |
2013-08-22 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H4003 (Same As) 2014-03-04 - Introduced
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
776 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
776 | 013 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
776 | 032 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
790 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/116 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/0116/BillText/Filed/HTML |