FL S0112 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Agriculture
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Agriculture
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing program eligibility requirements for nonprofit organizations and revising eligibility requirements for community development financial institutions; revising requirements for program applicants and projects; revising the purposes for which project funding may be used; requiring the Office of Program Policy Analysis and Government Accountability to review the program and collected data after a specified timeframe and provide the Legislature with a specified report, etc.
Title
Healthy Food Financing Initiative Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Senate | Died in Agriculture |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-10-17 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture; Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Fiscal Policy |
2023-10-04 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
595 | 401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
595 | 402 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
595 | 404 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
595 | 408 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
595 | 501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
595 | 801 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/112 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/112/BillText/Filed/HTML |