FL S0108 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing that the prohibition against the removal, cutting, marring, defacing, or destruction of trees or other vegetation in certain rights-of-way does not apply if the Department of Transportation suspends such prohibition pursuant to a declared state of emergency; requiring the department to publish informational guidelines regarding the removal of debris from certain emergencies, etc.
Title
Trees and Vegetation Within the Rights-of-way of Certain Roads and Rail Corridors
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#15 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - Senate - Senate Community Affairs (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate Transportation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - Senate - Senate Community Affairs (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate Transportation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | House | Died in Messages |
2023-04-12 | House | In Messages |
2023-04-11 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/11/23 |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 |
2023-03-10 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/15/23, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2023-03-07 | Senate | CS by Transportation read 1st time |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-03-02 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/07/23, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Building |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Now in Community Affairs |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2023-02-14 | Senate | CS by Transportation; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2023-02-06 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 02/14/23, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2023-01-04 | Senate | Referred to Transportation; Community Affairs; Rules |
2022-12-27 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H55 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died in Transportation & Modals Subcommittee