FL S0108 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Children and Families to adopt rules to include specified requirements within minimum standards relating to a written plan for the daily provision of varied activities at a child care facility, etc.
Title
Child Care Facilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | Senate | Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs |
2013-04-10 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 04/15/13, 1:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-01-04 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Education; Rules |
2012-12-11 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0547 (Same As) 2013-05-03 - Died in Healthy Families Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
402 | 302 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
402 | 305 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/108 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0108/BillText/Filed/HTML |